IL HB3193 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-04 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Creates the Statewide Deferred Prosecution Funding Program, to provide grants to State's Attorneys to operate deferred prosecution programs for misdemeanor offenses. Provides eligibility requirements and rulemaking authority for the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority Act. Creates the Statewide Deferred Prosecution Funding Program Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to make a conforming change.
Title
DEFERRED PROSECUTION-GRANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3930 | 9.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3193&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3193.htm |