IL HB3201 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Property Control Act. Provides that all airplanes and helicopters owned by the State, except those designated for emergency use, those used by the Illinois State Police, and those used by a public university as part of a course in aviation, are surplus property and must be sold by a competitive sealed bid method (now, a transferable airplane may be disposed of only if (i) it is no longer needed, (ii) it will not be used as a trade-in, and (iii) a public university or college offering aviation-related instruction or training has not listed its need for an airplane). Requires that the sale proceeds be deposited into the Education Assistance Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
PROPERTY CONTROL-STATE PLANES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Diane Pappas |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 605 | 7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3201&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3201.htm |