IL HB3226 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that "first offender" means any person who, within 10 years (rather than 5 years) before the date of the current offense, has not had a driver's license suspension or revocation for refusing to submit to a chemical test or tests of blood, breath, or other bodily substance or urine for the purpose of determining the content of alcohol, other drug or drugs, or intoxicating compound or compounds or any combination thereof in the person's blood. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
VEH CD-FIRST OFFENDER LICENSE
Sponsors
Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Mike Murphy [R] |
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |