IL HB3227 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate Transactions Article of the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation to refuse to sell, rent, or otherwise make unavailable or deny, or to alter the terms, conditions, or privileges of the sale or rental, of a housing accommodation or dwelling to any buyer or renter due to the fact of an arrest, juvenile record, or criminal history record information ordered expunged, sealed, or impounded under the Criminal Identification Act. Effective immediately.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-HOUSING-ARREST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3227&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3227.htm |