IL HB3247 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Parkinson's Disease Public Awareness and Education Act. Provides that the Director of Public Health shall establish a Parkinson's Disease Public Awareness and Education Program. Provides that the purpose of the Program shall be to promote public awareness of Parkinson's disease and the value of early detection and possible treatments, including the benefits and risks of those treatments. Provides that the Department of Public Health may accept for that purpose any special grant of moneys, services, or property from the federal government or any of its agencies, or from any foundation, organization, or medical school. Provides that the Program shall focus on the development of specified programs and services. Provides that the Department shall prepare an information booklet in English, Spanish, and Mandarin which provides information about the symptoms and treatment of Parkinson's disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PARKINSON'S DISEASE AWARENESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback