IL HB3250 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax checkoff for contributions to a qualified veterans home fund. Provides that "qualified veterans home fund" means any of the following: (i) the LaSalle Veterans Home Fund; (ii) the Anna Veterans Home Fund; (iii) the Manteno Veterans Home Fund; or (iv) the Quincy Veterans Home Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-VETERANS HOMES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3250&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3250.htm |