IL HB3281 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that a taxing district shall reduce its aggregate extension base for the purpose of lowering its limiting rate for future years upon referendum approval initiated by the submission of a petition by the voters of the district. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-AGGREGATE EXTENSION
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-207 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3281&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3281.htm |