IL HB3289 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Provides that the term "business" means a business that has annual gross sales of less than $150,000,000 (currently, $75,000,000) as evidenced by the federal income tax return of the business.
Title
BUSINESS ENTERPRISE-BUSINESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | To Agency Operation Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 575 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |