IL HB3301 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that in Joliet Township, Troy Township, Lockport Township, DuPage Township, Wheatland Township, and Plainfield Township in Will County: the office of township clerk is abolished; the term of any elected or appointed township clerk is terminated; and the Will County Clerk assumes the duties and rights of each township clerk until a deputy clerk is appointed for each affected township. Provides that no later than 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Will County Clerk must appoint a deputy clerk for each office of township clerk abolished. Provides that the deputy clerk has the rights and duties of a township clerk, shall report to the Will County Clerk, and shall perform his or her duties at the office for the township clerk provided by the township, if any. Provides for reappointment by the township board of a deputy clerk in office on the effective date of the amendatory Act who was appointed by a township clerk. Provides that the deputy clerk appointed by the Will County Clerk may not cast a vote to break a tie to fill a vacancy in a township office, but rather, if the tie vote remains unresolved for 60 days, the township board must call a special township meeting to be held no later than 90 days after the initial tie vote at which time the electors present at the special township meeting shall by majority vote fill the vacancy. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ELIMINATE WILL CO TWP CLERKS
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 010-003-001 |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |