IL HB3308 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 5 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 5 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sports Wagering Act. Contains only a short title provision.
Title
SPORTS WAGERING-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 5 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |