IL HB3318 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides for a credit in an amount equal to 25% of the taxpayer's equity investment in a qualified new business venture, including investments made through a certified fund manager. Sets forth limitations on the credit.
Title
VENTURE CAPITAL CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-02-05 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |