IL HB3328 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall implement a project to be called the Renewable Energy Pay As You Save Program. Provides for the purpose and requirements of the Program. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall convene a workshop process during which interested participants may discuss issues related to the Program. Provides that each applicable electric utility shall submit an informational filing to the Commission that describes its plan for implementing provisions regarding the Program. Provides that electric utilities shall work with lenders selected pursuant to a request for proposals process and with vendors to establish the terms and processes under which a participant can purchase eligible renewable energy generation and energy storage systems using the financing obtained from a lender through a financing program designed to fit the Pay As You Save model. Provides further requirements concerning the establishment of financing programs based upon the Pay As You Save model. Provides that the Commission shall adopt all rules necessary for administration. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENERGY-PAY AS YOU SAVE PROGRAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2038551-59New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback