IL HB3331 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Homelessness Prevention Act. Changes certain types of assistance grantees shall offer households to prevent homelessness as follows: (1) payment of a rent or mortgage arrearage (rather than payment of a rent or mortgage arrearage in an amount established as necessary to defeat the eviction or foreclosure, but shall in no event be greater than 3 months of rental or mortgage arrears); (2) payment of a security deposit (rather than payment of a rent deposit or security deposit and payment of not more than 2 months rent or mortgage payments); and (3) payment of rent or mortgage. Provides that in no case shall the total assistance for a household be greater than the equivalent of 6 months of rent or mortgage payments. Provides that, on an annual basis, a grantee's administrative costs and case management expenses shall not exceed 15% of the grant amount it receives.
Title
HOUSING-GRANTS TO HOMELESS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0280 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-001-000 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-08 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
310 | 70 | 12.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
310 | 70 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |