IL HB3339 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Horse-drawn Carriage Regulation and Safety Act. Establishes requirements for the lawful operation of horse-drawn carriages and the horse-drawn carriage trade in the State. Requires licenses and identification cards issued by the Secretary of State for persons involved in the horse-drawn carriage trade. Provides requirements for the care of horses used horse-drawn carriages. Provides for prohibitions, including inclement weather conditions, when it is unlawful to operate a horse-drawn carriage in the State. Establishes rulemaking authority for the Secretary of State, in consultation with the Department of Transportation, Department of State Police, the Department of Agriculture, and any other relevant State agency. Defines terms. Makes other changes.
Title
REGULATION OF HORSE CARRIAGES
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |