IL HB3359 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Video Service Tax Modernization Act. Imposes a tax upon the act or privilege of providing direct-to-home satellite service, direct broadcast satellite service, or digital audio-visual works to a subscriber in the State. Provides that the tax is imposed at the rate of 5% of the provider's gross revenues derived from or attributable to that subscriber. Creates the Entertainment Tax Fairness Act. Imposes a tax upon the subscribers of entertainment in the State at the rate of 1% of the charges paid for the privilege to witness, view, or otherwise enjoy the entertainment. Defines "entertainment" as any paid video programming, direct-to-home satellite service, direct broadcast satellite service, digital audio-visual works service, or video service to a subscriber in the State.
Title
REVENUE-VIDEO-ENTERTAINMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3359&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3359.htm |