IL HB3373 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Blue Collar Jobs Act. Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Creates a High Impact Business construction jobs credit and an Enterprise Zone construction jobs credit against the taxpayer's Illinois income taxes based on the incremental income tax attributable to laborers or workers employed at certain construction sites located in Enterprise Zones. Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Creates a New Construction EDGE Credit based on the incremental income tax attributable to laborers or workers employed at construction sites associated with EDGE projects. Amends the River Edge Redevelopment Zone Act. Creates a River Edge construction jobs credit based on the incremental income tax attributable to laborers or workers employed at certain construction sites in a River Edge Redevelopment Zone. Requires contractors and subcontractors associated with projects that receive credits under the amendatory Act to file certified payroll information with the Department of Labor and the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity.
Title
BLUE COLLAR JOBS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 655 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 655 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 10 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 10 | 5-51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 10 | 5-56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 115 | 10-10.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 115 | 10-10.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 115 | 10-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3373&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3373.htm |