IL HB3394 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Provides that, no later than the close of the 2020 calendar year, a publicly held domestic or foreign corporation whose principal executive offices, according to the corporation's SEC 10-K form, are located in Illinois shall have a minimum of one female director and one African American director on its board of directors. Provides that the Secretary of State shall publish a report on its website documenting the number of corporations that have at least one female director and one African American director, the number of corporations that were in compliance at one point during the preceding calendar year, the number of corporations that moved to Illinois during the preceding calendar year, and the number of corporations that were previously subject to the requirements during the preceding year but are no longer publicly traded. Provides penalties for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BUS CORP-BOARD RACE SEX

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-08-27HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0589
2019-08-27HouseEffective Date August 27, 2019
2019-08-27HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-06-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-06-01HousePassed Both Houses
2019-06-01HouseHouse Concurs
2019-06-01House3/5 Vote Required
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 105-000-000
2019-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-010-000
2019-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
2019-05-30HouseArrived in House
2019-05-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-016-000
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Belt
2019-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-05-29SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 007-001-000
2019-05-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-28SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-05-28SenateRe-assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-05-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-16SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-02SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-04SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-027-000
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80558.10.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3394&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3394.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3394eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3394enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0589.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3394ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3394sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3394sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3394sam003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3394_03292019_051000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB3394_05302019_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3394sam003_06012019_035000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback