IL HB3396 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Stalking No Contact Order Act. Provides that if an emergency stalking no contact order is granted on a court holiday or evening, the court shall immediately file a certified copy of the order with the sheriff or other law enforcement official charged with maintaining Department of State Police records (rather than on the next court day).
Title
STALKING NO CONTACT-NOTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0508 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 21 | 115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 21 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |