IL HB3404 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. Provides that, for the 2020-2021 academic year and for each academic year thereafter, a university or community college district must make available to its students information on all mental health and suicide prevention resources available at the university or community college.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-MENTAL HEALTH INFO

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2019-03-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 020-000-000
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110305105New CodeSee Bill Text
11052090New CodeSee Bill Text
1106605-200New CodeSee Bill Text
11066510-200New CodeSee Bill Text
11067015-200New CodeSee Bill Text
11067520-205New CodeSee Bill Text
11068025-200New CodeSee Bill Text
11068530-210New CodeSee Bill Text
11069035-205New CodeSee Bill Text
1108053-29.13New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback