IL HB3405 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that gratuities to employees are the property of the employees and may not be retained by an employer. Provides that an employer's retention of gratuities is an underpayment of wages for purposes of the Act. Provides that the new provisions do not prohibit tip pooling as permitted by law. Provides that the new provisions do not affect an employer's entitlement to an allowance for gratuities to the extent permitted under the Minimum Wage Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GRATUITIES-RETENTION-PROHIBIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-22HouseArrived in House
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino
2019-05-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 012-000-000
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Labor; 015-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-10HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-008-000
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201154.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback