IL HB3406 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption, provides that, for taxable years 2019 and thereafter, the maximum income limitation is $85,000 (currently, $65,000). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-08-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-07-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-07-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-07-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-07-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-06-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-06-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-06-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Karina Villa

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback