IL HB3426 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Re-Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Re-Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on December 7, 1998 by the City of Quincy for the Central Business District West Tax Increment Redevelopment Project Area. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-LEASEHOLD-AIRPORTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Re-Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-12-16 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-14 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-14 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-11-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-11-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-11-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-11-14 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-11-14 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-11-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-11-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-001-000 |
2019-11-13 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Tracy |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-001-000 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 13, 2019 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-005-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2019-03-28 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-14 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 9-195 | Amended Code | Citation Text |