IL HB3435 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a policy of accident and health insurance or a managed care plan shall provide coverage for epinephrine injectors for persons 18 years of age or under. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
INS CODE-EPINEPHRINE INJECTOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0281 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-000-003 |
2019-03-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 022-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 022-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |