IL HB3437 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance of developmental disabilities awareness decals for Universal special license plates by the Department of Human Services. Provides fees for the decals. Creates the Developmental Disabilities Awareness Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that money in the Fund shall be paid as grants to the Illinois Department of Human Services to fund legal aid groups to assist with guardianship fees for private citizens willing to become guardians for individuals with developmental disabilities but who are unable to pay the legal fees associated with becoming a guardian. Makes a corresponding change in the State Finance Act. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
VEH CD-DISABILITIES AWARENESS
Sponsors
Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0282 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |