IL HB3446 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision concerning eligibility for temporary disability benefits or total and permanent disability benefits, removes a requirement that an interruption in service for a specified period must have been with the same participating municipality or participating instrumentality. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF-DISABILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0151 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date July 26, 2019 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-005-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-002-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |