IL HB3472 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance shall provide coverage for the cost of opioid treatment drugs, including, but not limited to, opioid antagonists, regardless of whether or not they are generic drug formularies, and other buprenorphine-based medications meant to treat opioid addiction or prevent overdose by opioid use. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
INS CODE-OPIOID TREATMENT DRUG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3472&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3472.htm |