IL HB3480 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Illinois Juvenile Justice Commission shall include recommendations regarding the funding of detention, the transparency and evaluation of the use of detention, and the availability of youth services to reduce the use of detention and prevent deeper criminal involvement in its annual submission of recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that on or after January 1, 2020, detention of a minor shall be a last resort and only in the case of any minor 14 years of age or older arrested on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act if there is probable cause to believe that the minor is a delinquent minor charged with a felony offense, that secured custody is the least restrictive alternative available, and is a matter of immediate and urgent necessity for the protection of the minor or of the person of another. Provides that any minor placed in detention shall immediately have counsel appointed and an opportunity to privately consult with counsel in person, and have a review of the decision to detain within 24 hours of the placement in detention. Provides that unless sooner released, a minor alleged to be a delinquent minor taken into temporary custody must be brought before a judicial officer within 24 hours including Saturdays, Sundays, and court-designated holidays for a detention or shelter care hearing to determine whether he or she shall be further held in custody. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-AGE OF DETENTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2050517a-9Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-410Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-415Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback