IL HB3481 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cigarette Machine Operators' Occupation Tax Act, the Cigarette Tax Act, the Cigarette Use Tax Act, the Tobacco Products Tax Act of 1995, the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act, the Live Adult Entertainment Facility Surcharge Act, the Illinois Hydraulic Fracturing Tax Act, the Gas Revenue Tax Act, the Public Utilities Revenue Act, the Telecommunications Excise Tax Act, the Electricity Excise tax Act, the Bingo License and Tax Act, the Illinois Pull Tabs and Jar Games Act, the Charitable Games Act, the Liquor Control Act of 1934, the Environmental Protection Act, the Environmental Impact Fee Law, and the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Provides that, if a payment provided for under one of those Acts exceeds the taxpayer's liability under that Act, then the taxpayer may credit the excess payment against liability subsequently to be remitted to the Department of Revenue. Amends the Renewable Energy, Energy Efficiency, and Coal Resources Development Law of 1997 and the Energy Assistance Act to incorporate certain provisions of the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act.
Title
REVENUE-PAYMENTS
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Stewart [R] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 687 | 6-8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
230 | 20 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 25 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 8-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 20 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 128 | 1-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 135 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 143 | 10-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 145 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 175 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 450 | 2-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 450 | 2-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 615 | 2a.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 615 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 620 | 2a.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 630 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 640 | 2-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 640 | 2-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 125 | 315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 135 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 55.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3481&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3481.htm |