IL HB3482 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lake Michigan Wind Energy Act. Provides that the Offshore Wind Energy Economic Development Policy Task Force shall report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly within 12 months of convening. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall adopt rules by which it may grant in the name of the State of Illinois permits and site leases with respect to public trust lands of Lake Michigan for the assessment of sites for offshore wind energy development. Provides that if the Department receives an application for such a site assessment permit and lease in advance of the adoption of such rules, the Department may grant such permit and lease, and in considering such application shall take into account the general principles set forth in the Act as well as existing environmental, marine, public infrastructure, transportation, and security uses and factors. Provides that in advance of rulemaking specific to the Act no site for which an assessment permit or lease is granted shall be within 3 miles of the shore of Lake Michigan, nor shall it include known breeding grounds or habitat of any avian species considered threatened or endangered under federal or State law. Effective immediately.
Title
LAKE MICHIGAN-PERMIT/LEASE
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0283 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 896 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 896 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |