IL HB3487 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the University of Illinois Hospital Act and Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that each hospital shall post, in each facility that has an emergency room, a notice in a conspicuous location in the emergency room with information about how to enroll in health insurance through the Illinois health insurance marketplace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOSPITAL-HEALTH INSURANCE POST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass Insurance; 018-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Insurance
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-005-001
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 022-000-000
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1103306.7New CodeSee Bill Text
210856.14cAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback