IL HB3495 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that on or before January 1, 2020, the Department of Children and Family Services, in consultation with the Department of Public Health, shall adopt rules that require child care facilities to implement an emergency action plan for an active shooter scenario. Effective immediately.
Title
CHILD CARE-ACTIVE SHOOTER PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 010-004-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3495&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3495.htm |