IL HB3516 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rehabilitation of Persons with Disabilities Act. In provisions concerning the program of services the Department of Human Services must provide to prevent the unnecessary institutionalization of persons with disabilities who are in need of long term care, requires the Department to provide medical services, including, but not limited to, nursing staff services for basic medical care.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2405 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |