IL HB3536 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall accept a Department of Defense honorable discharge certificate from an applicant for a veteran designation as proof of veteran status if the applicant did not receive a Department of Defense certificate of release or discharge from active duty upon the completion of initial basic training. Effective immediately.
Title
SOS-VETERAN DOCUMENTATION
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0287 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |