IL HB3541 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for a vendor to decide on the basis of unlawful discrimination which candidates are required to take a test required for application or consideration of the government job. Provides that if a vendor violates the Act, then the vendor is subject to a $1,000,000 civil penalty for each violation. Provides that any government contract with a vendor that violates the Act shall be terminated. Provides that a government entity shall not contract with a vendor for one year after a determination that the vendor has violated the new provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
RIGHTS-GOVT JOB CANDIDATES
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] | Rep. Mark Walker [D] | Rep. Yehiel Kalish [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-006-000; FAILED |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |