IL HB3564 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Deletes obsolete language regarding the terms of office of the initial Illinois Gaming Board members and their successors. Amends the Video Gaming Act. Deletes language providing that every video gaming terminal offered in this State must meet minimum standards set by an independent outside testing laboratory approved by the Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL GAMING BOARD-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-04-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230105Amended CodeCitation Text
2304015Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback