IL HB3567 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning in State fiscal year 2020, the specified income threshold shall be no less than 200% of the then-current federal poverty level for each family size. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
DHS-CHILD CARE-INCOME LEVELS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 9A-2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3567&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3567.htm |