IL HB3570 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Industrial New Jobs Training Act. Provides that community college may enter into an agreement with an employer in which the employer provides certain education and job-training services. Provides that the program shall be funded by: (1) a new jobs credit from withholding to be received or derived from new employment resulting from the project; (2) tuition, student fees, or special charges fixed by the Board to defray program costs in whole or in part; or(3) a guarantee of payments to be received under paragraph (1) or (2). Provides that the community college may issue certificates for funding of the program. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to make conforming changes.
Title
JOBS TRAINING CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 704A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3570&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3570.htm |