IL HB3576 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Violence Prevention Act. Removes the term "committed person" and replaces it with "custodial detainee" throughout the Act. Requires health care providers that employ a health care worker to display a notice stating that physical battery (rather than physical assault) will be reported to law enforcement.
Title
HEALTH-VIOLENCE PREVENTION
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 160 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 160 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 160 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 160 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |