IL HB3580 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Provides that a certificate of good conduct does not limit any employer, landlord, judicial proceeding, administrative, licensing, or other body, board, or authority from accessing criminal background information; nor does it hide, alter, or expunge the record. Provides that the existence of a certificate of good conduct does not preclude a landlord or an administrative, licensing, or other body, board, or authority from retaining full discretion to grant or deny the application for housing or licensure.
Title
CD CORR-GOOD CONDUCT
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Rep. Delia Ramirez [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0154 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-017-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-043-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-5.5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |