IL HB3584 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill. Provides that victim impact statements received by the Prisoner Review Board shall be confidential and privileged (rather than confidential and not discoverable in litigation). Provides that the written report of the Board's recommendations to the Governor shall be privileged (rather than not discoverable in litigation). Makes conforming changes.
Title
VICTIM STATEMENTS-DISCOVERY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0288 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 120 | 4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 120 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 105 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-3-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-3-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |