IL HB3587 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adoption Act. Changes the definition of "post-placement and post-adoption support services". Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall establish and maintain a toll-free number to respond to requests from the public about its post-placement and post-adoption support services. Provides that the Department shall provide information about post-placement and post-adoption support services to prospective adoptive parents and guardians as part of its adoption and guardianship training. Provides that the Department shall include specific information in its annual notification letter. Provides that the Department shall review and update annually all information relating to its post-placement and post-adoption support services. Provides that beginning one year after the effective date of the Act (instead of 1 year after the effective date of Public Act 99-49), the Department shall report annually to the General Assembly regarding specified information. To the reporting requirements, adds: the number of guardians, prospective adoptive parents, and adoptive families in this State who have received the Department's post-placement and post-adoption support services and the types of services provided and for each, the length of time between their initial contact to the Department to request post-placement and post-adoption support services and their first receipt of services, the type of services received, and a description of the coordination between the Department and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to develop resources.
Title
ADOPTION-POST-PLACEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0155 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 50 | 18.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |