IL HB3588 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes structural changes concerning homestead exemptions by creating separate divisions for homestead exemptions in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and counties with fewer than 3,000,000 inhabitants. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
PROP TX-HOMESTEAD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 10-21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 10-800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-163 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-167 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-168 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-173 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-174 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-176 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-261 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-262 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-263 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-265 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-267 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-268 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-269 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-270 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-272 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-273 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-275 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-280 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 15-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 9-275 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3588&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3588.htm |