IL HB3589 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equitable Restrooms Act. Provides that every single-occupancy restroom in a place of public accommodation or public building shall be identified as all-gender and designated for use by no more than one person at a time or for family or assisted use. Provides that "place of public accommodation" has the meaning provided in the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that each single-occupancy restroom shall be outfitted with exterior signage indicating "all-gender" or "gender-neutral". Provides that these provisions apply to any existing or future places of public accommodation or public buildings. Provides that during an inspection of a place of public accommodation or public building by a health officer or health inspector, the health officer or health inspector may inspect the place of accommodation or public building to determine whether it complies. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-003-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 39 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |