IL HB3590 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that winnings from pari-mutuel wagering conducted at a wagering facility licensed under the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975 or from winnings from gambling games conducted on a riverboat licensed under the Riverboat Gambling Act are taxable as income in this State, for both residents and nonresidents. Provides that such winners must withhold Illinois income tax from their winnings, if the payment of winnings must be reported to the Internal Revenue Service by the person making the payment. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INCOME TAX-GAMBLING WINNINGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-001
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-28HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2019-03-28HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-03-14HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355303Amended CodeCitation Text
355304Amended CodeCitation Text
355710Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback