IL HB3597 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in a county with a population of more than 500,000 that does not have an elected county board chairman or executive and has an appointed supervisor of assessments, the office of supervisor of assessments shall be an elected position beginning with the general election held in 2020. The supervisor of assessments serving on the date of the election shall continue to serve until his or her successor is elected and qualified.
Title
PROP TX-COUNTY ASSESSOR
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2020 |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-29 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-000-001 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |