IL HB3604 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a vote to prohibit sales at retail of alcoholic liquor (or alcoholic liquor other than beer containing not more than 4% of alcohol by weight or alcoholic liquor containing more than 4% alcohol by weight in the original package and not for consumption on the premises) in a precinct in a city, village, or incorporated town of more than 200,000 inhabitants shall not apply to retail sales of alcoholic liquor by a specific private institution of higher learning or an affiliate thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-LOCAL REFERENDUM EXEMPT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-002-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 017-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-014-000
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23559-2dNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback