IL HB3613 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to 10% of the salary or stipend paid to a qualified intern during the taxable year. Provides that, if the qualified intern is hired by the taxpayer on a full-time basis upon graduation, the employer is entitled to the credit for each of the first 2 years of the intern's full-time employment with the taxpayer. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-INTERN CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3613&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3613.htm |