IL HB3622 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-11)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions and State Employees Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the alternative retirement annuity under the State Employees Article applies to a conservation police officer subject to the Tier 2 provisions. Provides that a conservation police officer subject to the Tier 2 provisions may convert up to 8 years of service credit established before the effective date of the amendatory Act as a conservation police officer under the State Employees Article into eligible creditable service by filing a written election with the Board under that Article, accompanied by a specified payment. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-SERS-CONSERVATION POLICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3622&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3622.htm |