IL HB3631 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that, for applicants with access to confidential financial information or who submit documentation to support billing, the Department of Children and Family Services may, in its discretion, deny or refuse to renew a license to an applicant (rather than no applicant may receive a license from the Department or a child care facility licensed by the Department) who has been convicted of committing or attempting to commit any of the following felony offenses: financial institution fraud; identity theft; financial exploitation; computer tampering; aggravated computer tampering; computer fraud; deceptive practices; forgery; State benefits fraud; mail fraud and wire fraud; and theft. Effective immediately.
Title
CHILD CARE-APPLICANT-FELONY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0112 |
2019-07-19 | House | Effective Date July 19, 2019 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-018-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-003-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-044-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 012-001-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |