IL HB3638 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that on or before January 1, 2023, the State Board of Education shall create a model curriculum that may be used by school districts for the teaching of the Vietnamese and Laotian American refugee experience and a model curriculum on the Cambodian genocide. Provides that the curricula must be developed in an age-appropriate manner for instruction in kindergarten through grade 12; specifies other curriculum requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] |
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-007-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-26 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34A-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |